Lepage, Robert Stephen (CPSO#: 58016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 869-1420
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert S. Lepage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lepage ( CPSO# 58016 )

Business Address:
Ornge
Suite 204
850 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T7
Phone Number: (705) 670-0333

Business Address:
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-4120

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT STEPHEN LEPAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEPAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1989