Leroi, Iracema (CPSO#: 67124)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 1996 to 20 Dec 1996
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 1996