Leroux, Timothy Sean (CPSO#: 90830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 1 East 436
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6286
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy S. Leroux Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Leroux ( CPSO# 90830 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
63 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 1 East 427
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5267

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY SEAN LEROUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEROUX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016