Wright, Leslie Curtis (CPSO#: 66939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
265 Yorkland Boulevard
North York ON  M2J 1S5
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Fax: (416) 229-9771
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 22 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., February 21, 2018, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term,
            condition and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by
            Dr. Leslie Curtis Wright:

                  Dr. Wright will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and
            professionalismby obtaining an unconditional pass, at his own expense, or any
                  alternate course in ethics and professionalism approved by the College,
                  by August 31, 2018. Dr. Wright will agree to abide by any recommendations
                  of the PROBE program and provide proof of completion to the College.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Feb 2018
Summary:

On February 21, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Leslie Curtis Wright committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.  
 
Dr. Wright is a psychiatrist who practises in Toronto. He obtained his medical degree in 1993, 
completed his specialty training in psychiatry in 1998, and obtained his Certificate of 
Independent Practice in Ontario on June 30, 1998.  
 
In about 2012, Dr. Wright became particularly active on social media sites, including 
Facebook groups touching on various social and political issues, including feminist issues. 
When posting messages in the online chat groups, Dr. Wright identified himself as a 
psychiatrist who is single and practising in the city of Toronto. 
 
Beginning in 2012, Dr. Wright began to, by various online messaging routes, systematically 
approach and befriend women who were also followers of the Facebook groups in which Dr. 
Wright participated, or who were friends of the followers he befriended. All of the women 
resided in the United States. After establishing a connection, Dr. Wright would immediately 
send numerous messages to the women. The original messages were about shared issues from 
the Facebook groups (generally “progressive” feminist issues). In the messages, Dr. Wright 
referred to his status as a psychiatrist in Ontario and discussed therapeutic techniques and 
mental health issues in a general manner. Dr. Wright then rapidly sexualized the conversations, 
engaging in online sexual relationships in a lewd manner. This included sending the women 
naked pictures of himself, including his genitalia, and encouraging them to send him naked 
pictures of themselves, including their genitalia. He engaged in repeated, explicit and graphic 
intimate and online sexual behaviour with multiple women at the same time. When one of the 
women got upset with him about his continued sexualization of their discussions, he replied 
“No one is responsible for another’s feelings. Cardinal rule in my line of work.” On occasion, 
Dr. Wright would provide medical comments directly connected to the women’s own health 
issues such as post-surgical pain, fibromyalgia, chronic pain and the use of narcotics. 
 
The women with whom Dr. Wright established these relationships on the internet learned that 
he had engaged in the same behaviour with multiple women at the same time. The women 
requested that Dr. Wright cease contacting them, but he did not immediately do so. The women 
were not patients of Dr. Wright.  
 
The College has a guideline on social media use by its members. It recommends, among other 
things, that physicians:  
         “Protect their own reputation, the reputation of the profession, and the public 
         trust by not posting content that could be viewed as unprofessional. Be 
         mindful of their Internet presence, and be proactive in removing content 
         posted by themselves or others which may be viewed as unprofessional.” 
 
Disposition 
 
On February 21, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Wright’s Certificate of Registration for a one month period, 
   commencing February 22, 2018. 
-  The Registrar impose the following as a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Wright’s 
   certificate of registration: 
    -  Dr.  Wright  will  successfully  complete  the  PROBE  course  in  ethics  and 
       professionalism  by  obtaining  an  unconditional  pass,  at  his  own  expense,  or  any 
       alternate course in ethics and professionalism approved by the College, by August 
       31, 2018. Dr. Wright will agree to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE 
       program and provide proof of completion to the College. 
-   Dr. Wright appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-   Dr. Wright pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of 
    the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Date: February 21, 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 13, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Findings:

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.
The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

Leslie C WRIGHT has been convicted of operating a motor vehicle while his ability to operate a motor vehicle was impaired by alcohol contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. A probation order was made against Dr. Wright on November 13, 2015 for a period of 18 months. Dr. Wright is prohibited from operating a motor vehicle on any street, road, highway or other public place for a period of 2 years from November 13, 2015. Dr. Wright was also ordered to pay a fine of $3000, plus a victim surcharge of $900, to be paid within 6 months.