Leto, Daniela Laura (CPSO#: 82433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
711 Concession Street,
Room A3-70 Department of Medicine
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43251
Fax: (905) 389-0108
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Life Labs
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga, Ontario
L5T 2X4
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Canada
Phone: 905-565-0433 Ext. 32310
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniela Leto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leto ( CPSO# 82433 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Medicine - Room A3-70
711 Concession Street
Toronto ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Life Labs
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga ON  L5T 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 565-0433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELA LAURA LETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009