Leucht, Stephan Thomas (CPSO#: 92110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2018

Expiry Date:  31 Oct 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Humboldt University of Berlin, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterdown Pediatrics
130 - 170 Rockhaven Ln
Waterdown ON  L8B 1B5
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Nov 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 04 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Stephan  Thomas  Leucht  may  practise  paediatrics  with  Waterdown
                  Pediatrics in Waterdown, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated  by
                  a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or  when  Dr. Leucht's eligibility to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Leucht's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude,  does  not provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College by the due date or if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Leucht's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 1,  2018,  and  will  expire on or
                  before October 31, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.