Leung, Deborah Wing Sze (CPSO#: 80846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Leung, Debbie Wing-Sze (used until: 25 Aug 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
West Building, 5th floor
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2215
Fax: 905-830-5977
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Family Health Team
377 Church St
Suite 101
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 471-9999
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah W.S. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leung ( CPSO# 80846 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Child & Family Clinic
West 5
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Markham Family Health Team
377 Church Street
Suite 101
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH WING SZE LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009