Leung, Eric Wing-On (CPSO#: 86310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre
T-Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6165
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tran Le and Dr. Eric Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Le ( CPSO# 91592 )
Dr. E. Leung ( CPSO# 86310 )

Business Address:
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 221
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
T Wing
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6165

Business Address:
2101 Brimley Road
Suite 109
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
Suite 705
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 481-4433

Business Address:
7 Elmwood Avenue
North York ON  M2N 6R6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC WING-ON LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2012