Leung, Eugene Yun Ching (CPSO#: 76309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8528 Ext. 2
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8528 Ext. 2
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

University Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Canada
Phone: (613) 696-7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leung Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leung ( CPSO# 76309 )
Dr. D. Tran ( CPSO# 80856 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
Department of Anaethesia
40 Ruskin Street
Rm 5207E
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE YUN CHING LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006