Leung, Kevin Kin-Man (CPSO#: 72583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hollandview Medical Centre
Unit 105
372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone: (905) 726-8332
Fax: (905) 726-9899
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin K.M. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leung ( CPSO# 72583 )

Business Address:
Hollandview Medical Centre
105 - 372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 726-8332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN KIN-MAN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000