Leung, Koon Chit Lawrence (CPSO#: 86873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Cambridge, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southbank Medical Centre
3-2430 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone: 613-736-6946 Ext. ext 6
Fax: 613-736-6948
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.C.L. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leung ( CPSO# 86873 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
2430 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone Number: (613) 736-6946

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOON CHIT LAWRENCE LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012