Leung, Tsui Pik Doris (CPSO#: 91119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
B3 218
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-663-3283
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TSUI PIK DORIS LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015