Lev-Ran, Shaul (CPSO#: 94310)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 10 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012