Levasseur, Liisa Kimberley (CPSO#: 89030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
City of Lakes Family Health Team
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON  P3Y 1J3
Phone: (705) 692-1018
Fax: (705) 692-7156
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liisa Levasseur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Levasseur ( CPSO# 89030 )

Business Address:
City of Lakes Family Health Team
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON  P3Y 1J3
Phone Number: (705) 692-1018

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIISA KIMBERLEY LEVASSEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVASSEUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 18 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011