Leventis, Anastasios (CPSO#: 74948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759 Ext. 2305
Fax: (905) 773-1325
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leventis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Leventis ( CPSO# 74948 )

Business Address:
100 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANASTASIOS LEVENTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENTIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002