Levesque, Michael Anthony (CPSO#: 79435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 682-6451
Fax: (905) 682-3391
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Levesque Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levesque ( CPSO# 79435 )

Business Address:
Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 682-6451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANTHONY LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008