Levichek, Zinaida (CPSO#: 74400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:The Azerbaijan N.Narimanov Memorial Stat, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
307 Sheppard Ave West
Unit M1
North York ON  M2N 1N6
Phone: 416-225-9696
Fax: 416-225-9697
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZINAIDA LEVICHEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVICHEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 17 May 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 18 May 2004 to 08 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2005 to 08 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009