Levine, Richard Jay (CPSO#: 78178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 686-6411 Ext. 4305
Fax: (905) 721-4770
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

95 Bayly St W,
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: 9054280444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727


Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Levine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Bowmanville Site
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Port Perry Site
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Whitby Site
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAY LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002