Levitt, Anthony Joseph (CPSO#: 55988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room FG 08
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5307
Fax: (416) 480-6022
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Giancola and A. Levitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Levitt ( CPSO# 55988 )
Dr. L. Giancola ( CPSO# 63514 )

Business Address:
2401 Yonge Street
Suite 210
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 485-9044

Business Address:
Suite FG03
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5307

Business Address:
607 Brair Hill Avenue
Toronto ON  M5N 1N4
Phone Number: (416) 782-3922

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOSEPH LEVITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVITT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jul 1992