Levitt, Kevin Samuel (CPSO#: 84443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 303
650 Sammon Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 778-1776
Fax: (416) 778-9814
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

500-491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin S. Levitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Levitt ( CPSO# 84443 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 303
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5

Business Address:
500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN SAMUEL LEVITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010