Levy, Isra Gabriel (CPSO#: 62746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1800 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa ON  K1G 4J5
Phone: (613) 7392121
Fax: (613) 7392099
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISRA GABRIEL LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1993