Levy, Rebecca Carolyn (CPSO#: 93220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Gurofsky, Rebecca Carolyn (used until: 31 Aug 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228232
Fax: 4168137909
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
7W
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-2817013
Fax: 4162817102
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Levy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levy ( CPSO# 93220 )

Business Address:
Th Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
7W
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA CAROLYN LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015