Lewin, Gabriela Analia (CPSO#: 84761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
305 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 728-7700
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriela Lewin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lewin ( CPSO# 84761 )

Business Address:
305 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 728-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIELA ANALIA LEWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008