Lewin, Warren Harris (CPSO#: 92778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
8 MCL Wing, Room 433
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5800 Ext. 3434
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN HARRIS LEWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 28 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2013