Lewis, Arthur Franklyn (CPSO#: 19427)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Date of Death: 15-Dec-2005

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2002

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: November 22, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 22, 2004, Dr. Arthur Franklyn Lewis has undertaken to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario,
-- to permanently cease to practise psychotherapy,
-- not to engage in any other form of individual treatment, psychological or otherwise,
with anyone who has not attained the age of majority,
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in
any jursidiction.