Lewis, Denice Colleen (CPSO#: 95514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 737-2257
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 300
601 Limoges Road
Limoges ON  K0A 2M0
Canada
Phone: (613) 714-9899
Fax: (613) 212-2233
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENICE COLLEEN LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2013