Lewis, Michael Eugene (CPSO#: 75081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1000 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 5G2
Phone: (416) 928-9343
Fax: (416) 928-9368
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

82 Buttonwood Avenue
York ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: 416-614-9494
Fax: (416) 245-9563
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

5935 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y8
Canada
Phone: 416-223-4050
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lewis and Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Grant ( CPSO# 75038 )
Dr. M. Lewis ( CPSO# 75081 )

Business Address:
2233 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L3
Phone Number: (416) 392-2300

Business Address:
Flemington Community Health Centre
10 Gateway Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 429-4991

Business Address:
5935 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y8
Phone Number: (416) 223-4050

Business Address:
82 Buttonwood Avenue
York ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 614-9494

Business Address:
1000 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 5G2
Phone Number: (416) 291-0222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL EUGENE LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002