Li, Adrienne Louise Kit (CPSO#: 95158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 301
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-554-1040
Fax: 905-554-1041
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adrienne Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Li ( CPSO# 95158 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
8th Floor - Room 816
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE LOUISE KIT LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016