Li, Cecilia Na (CPSO#: 96073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Ext. 4014
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75648
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CECILIA NA LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2014