Li, Debbie (CPSO#: 93039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905-845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBBIE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017