Li, Jennifer See Ngar (CPSO#: 103167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER SEE NGAR LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018