Li, Juliana Jing (CPSO#: 86546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Western University
Student Health Services
University Community Centre Room 11
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIANA JING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2013