Li, Katy Yi-Ting (CPSO#: 95100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
532 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 4H4
Phone: (905) 646-0015
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1400 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katy Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Li ( CPSO# 95100 )

Business Address:
318 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATY YI-TING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2014