Li, Olga (CPSO#: 90508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone: (647) 350-0550
Fax: (647) 350-0552
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Li ( CPSO# 90508 )

Business Address:
310 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLGA LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012