Li, Qinglu (CPSO#: 73788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 726-2060
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Salathiel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Li ( CPSO# 73788 )
Dr. I. Salathiel ( CPSO# 73717 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QINGLU LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2002