Liaconis, Haralambos (CPSO#: 74915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 753-2200
Fax: (519) 753-2202
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liaconis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Liaconis ( CPSO# 74915 )

Business Address:
202 - 217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone Number: (519) 753-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARALAMBOS LIACONIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIACONIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005