Liaschko, Alexander Agafonyikovitch (CPSO#: 75906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Leningradskij Sanitarno Gigieniceskij Me, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunningdale Health & Wellness Ctr
1695 Wonderland Rd N
London ON  N6G 4W3
Phone: (519) 641-6886
Fax: (519) 474-9779
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Apr 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 May 2008 to 02 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Alexander  Agafonyikovitch Liaschko may practise medicine independently in
            family medicine.