Licorish, Paulette Moreen (CPSO#: 73408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 15
9555 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M5
Phone: (647) 385-3363
Fax: (647) 427-2900
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health RIchmond Hill
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Markham-Stouville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Licorish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Licorish ( CPSO# 73408 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2310

Business Address:
15 - 9555 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M5
Phone Number: (647) 385-3363

Business Address:
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULETTE MOREEN LICORISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LICORISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004