Liebman, Mira Fern (CPSO#: 88470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2630
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3975
Fax: (613) 738-4828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Liebman & A. Breiner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Liebman ( CPSO# 88470 )
Dr. A. Breiner ( CPSO# 89064 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Hematology-Oncology
401 Smyth Road
Room 2630
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Suite C2196
1035 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 29 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRA FERN LIEBMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEBMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2013