Liebregts, Michelle Tanya (CPSO#: 91369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Liebregts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Liebregts ( CPSO# 91369 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE TANYA LIEBREGTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEBREGTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014