Liem, Nathania (CPSO#: 72487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: (519) 257-5137
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3719 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3S9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nathania Liem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Liem ( CPSO# 72487 )

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Business Address:
3719 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3S9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHANIA LIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003