Lilani, Rizwana Nisar (CPSO#: 92133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peace Medical Centre
20-9699 Jane Street
Maple ON  L6A 0A5
Phone: (905) 303-1770
Fax: (905) 303-1727
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C4Z3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rizwana Lilani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lilani ( CPSO# 92133 )

Business Address:
9699 Jane Street
Unit 20
Maple ON  L6A 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 303-1770

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RIZWANA NISAR LILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LILANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010