Lim, Andrew Sheng-Pei (CPSO#: 79437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2461
Fax: (416) 480-6092
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lim and Hew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lim ( CPSO# 79437 )
Dr. S. Hew ( CPSO# 82532 )

Business Address:
Division of Neurology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
304 - 4789 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G3
Phone Number: (416) 221-8612

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW SHENG-PEI LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008