Lim, Dianne Durante (CPSO#: 85239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4168131500
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Philippines

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANNE DURANTE LIM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LIM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. LIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LIM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019