Lim, Hilda Hue-Ching (CPSO#: 88825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
4631 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 4S5
Phone: (416) 293-6600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bill Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lim ( CPSO# 114092)
Dr. H. Lim ( CPSO# 88825 )
Dr. B. Lim ( CPSO# 31635 )

Business Address:
302B - 280 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 3A5
Phone Number: (416) 977-9888

Business Address:
4631 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 4S5
Phone Number: (416) 293-6600


Corporation Name: Dr. Hilda Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lim ( CPSO# 88825 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
4631 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 4S5
Phone Number: (416) 293-6600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILDA HUE-CHING LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010