Limotai, Chusak (CPSO#: 94190)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Srinakharinwirot University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jul 2010 to 28 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013