Lin, Charles Cheng Huei (CPSO#: 94360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Hospitalier Régional
De Lanaudière
1000 Boulevard Sainte-Anne
Saint-Charles-Borromée QC  J6E 6J2
Phone: (450) 759-8222
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cardiologie Cartier
380 Boulevard Cartier O
LAVAL QC  H7N 2K2
Canada
Phone: (450) 663-3228
County: 
Electoral District: 

Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 County Rd 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Canada
Phone: 6135252222
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES CHENG HUEI LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Aug 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2010 to 24 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011