Lin, Ching-Sheng Brian (CPSO#: 93399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613)729-8262
Fax: (613)729-7870
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Canada
Phone: 6137229900
Fax: 6137229100
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brecher Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lin ( CPSO# 93399 )
Dr. E. Brecher ( CPSO# 95729 )

Business Address:
Sexual Health Centre
Ottawa Public Health
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone Number: (613) 234-4641

Business Address:
Suite 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3

Business Address:
Suite 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 729-8262

Business Address:
Algonquin College
Health Services, Room C141
1385 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Phone Number: (613) 727-4723

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHING-SHENG BRIAN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014