Lincoln, Maximillian Christian (CPSO#: 83566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southeast Orthopedic Specialists
2627 Riverside Avenue, Suite 300
Jacksonville FL  32204
United States
Phone: (904) 634-0640

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAXIMILLIAN CHRISTIAN LINCOLN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINCOLN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2008 to 01 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: December 21, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On December 21, 2016, the Medical Board of Florida approved and adopted a Settlement Agreement between Dr. Lincoln and the Florida Department of Health as an Order of the Board. Dr. Lincoln was alleged to have performed a wrong site procedure, and the following penalties were imposed: a Letter of Concern; a fine of $3,000; costs of at least $1538.36; a requirement to complete a course in risk management; and a requirement for Dr. Lincoln to present a lecture or seminar on wrong site procedure to medical staff at an approved medical facility. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on December 21, 2016.