Linder, Mark Robin (CPSO#: 81391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West
M6S 1M4
Toronto ON  M6S 1M4
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Linder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linder ( CPSO# 81391 )

Business Address:
Suite 2 & 3
1959 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1M4
Phone Number: (416) 639-6321


Corporation Name: Linder Malek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malek ( CPSO# 93435 )
Dr. M. Linder ( CPSO# 81391 )

Business Address:
Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West
Unit 2 & 3
Toronto ON  M6S 1M4
Phone Number: (416) 639-6321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ROBIN LINDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2006